+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Amended
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Passed as amended
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Point of order overruled
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Recommitted to committee
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (4)
King, Phil
Type:
Primary Sponsor