+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor