+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed