+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Returned to committee
- Point of order sustained
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Correction in referral
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor