+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass
- Read 3rd time
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor