+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
On May 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Filed