+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor