+ − Actions (53)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Comptroller
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor