+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor