+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Corrected comm. report distributed
- Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor