+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Education
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/4/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed