+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor