+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Filed