+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed