+ − Actions (75)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Business & Commerce
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Filed