+ − Actions (64)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as amended
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor