+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/1/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Filed