+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/23/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed