+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed