+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor