+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/3/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed