+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor