+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor