+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor