+ − Actions (53)
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Received from the House
- Considered in public hearing
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Posting rule suspended
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor