+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Correction in referral
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Filed