+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed