+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed