+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed