+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor