+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/21/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor