+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/8/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Transportation
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor