+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed