+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/19/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to State Affairs
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/29/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor