+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/15/2019
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/3/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor