+ − Actions (47)
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order
- Point of order withdrawn
- Three day rule suspended
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor