+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/16/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/18/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor