+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Point of order overruled
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor