+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Received from the House
- Read first time
On May 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Passed
- Rules suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor