+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor