+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce
- Read first time
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed