+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor