+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor