+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor