+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/4/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed