+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (78)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Filed