+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/17
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed