+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed