+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (70)
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor