+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed